+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Judiciary
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 11, 2014
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Judiciary
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Judiciary
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On February 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor