+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (48)
On August 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1088
- Effective Date August 26, 2014
- Governor Approved
On June 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 057-000-000
On May 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Revenue; 009-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Revenue
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Michael E. Hastings
On May 28, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 066-049-000
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 29, 2014
On May 27, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
On May 26, 2014 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000
On May 23, 2014 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 30, 2014
On May 22, 2014 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Al Riley
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 009-000-000
On May 16, 2014 in the House:
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 23, 2014
On May 5, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Arrived in House
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 19, 2014
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Hastings
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 010-000-000
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Michael E. Hastings
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 26, 2014
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Assignments
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 16, 2013
- Second Reading
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2013
- Do Pass Executive; 010-000-000
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On January 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Amendment 001
Provides that the amendatory Act does not authorize a taxing district to increase its limiting rate or its aggregate extension (in the engrossed bill, limiting rate only) without first obtaining referendum approval.
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that the levies authorized under the Illinois Pension Code for social security or medicare shall not be considered new rates. Provides that the amendatory Act does not authorize a taxing district to increase its limiting rate without first obtaining referendum approval. Effective immediately.
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 35 ILCS 145/1 - from Ch. 120, par. 481b.31
- 35 ILCS 145/1 -
- 35 ILCS 200/18-190 -