+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On December 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
On April 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to State Government
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor