+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On March 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 3, 2010 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Energy
On February 24, 2010 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Energy
On February 10, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Bond
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor