+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On January 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On March 16, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Rules
On March 14, 2007 in the Senate:
- Held in Local Government
On March 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Local Government
On March 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Local Government
On February 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Local Government
On February 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Gary Forby
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
- 70 ILCS 1850/2.22 new -
- 70 ILCS 1850/3 - from Ch. 19, par. 403
- 70 ILCS 1850/4 - from Ch. 19, par. 404
- 70 ILCS 1850/4.3 new -
- 70 ILCS 1850/5 - from Ch. 19, par. 405
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor