+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On March 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 4, 2010 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Pensions and Investments
On February 24, 2010 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Pensions and Investments
On February 10, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Brady
+ − Statutes Amended (28)
- 40 ILCS 5/2-103.1 new -
- 40 ILCS 5/2-103.2 new -
- 40 ILCS 5/2-117.4 new -
- 40 ILCS 5/2-126 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 2-126
- 40 ILCS 5/2-126.2 new -
- 40 ILCS 5/2-162.1 new -
- 40 ILCS 5/14-103.40 new -
- 40 ILCS 5/14-103.41 new -
- 40 ILCS 5/14-105.8 new -
- 40 ILCS 5/14-133 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 14-133
- 40 ILCS 5/14-133.2 new -
- 40 ILCS 5/14-152.2 -
- 40 ILCS 5/15-103.3 -
- 40 ILCS 5/15-134.5 -
- 40 ILCS 5/15-158.2 -
- 40 ILCS 5/15-198.1 new -
- 40 ILCS 5/16-104.1 new -
- 40 ILCS 5/16-104.2 new -
- 40 ILCS 5/16-131.7 new -
- 40 ILCS 5/16-152 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 16-152
- 40 ILCS 5/16-158.2 new -
- 40 ILCS 5/16-203.1 new -
- 40 ILCS 5/18-105.1 new -
- 40 ILCS 5/18-105.2 new -
- 40 ILCS 5/18-123.3 new -
- 40 ILCS 5/18-133 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 18-133
- 40 ILCS 5/18-133.2 new -
- 40 ILCS 5/18-169.1 new -
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor