+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (63)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0665
- Effective Date June 23, 2014
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 055-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Public Health; 006-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Public Health
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Andy Manar
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - May 23, 2014
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-001-001
- Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Health Care Licenses Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 009-000-000
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Laura Fine
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Laura Fine
- Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Arrived in House
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Manar
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Third Reading - Passed; 045-009-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Public Health; 007-001-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Public Health
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 8, 2014
- Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 27, 2014
- Do Pass as Amended Public Health; 007-001-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Public Health
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Executive
- Postponed - Public Health
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar
- Re-assigned to Public Health
- Re-referred to Assignments
- Postponed - Executive
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar
- Assigned to Executive
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar
+ − Adopted Amendments (6)
House Amendment 002
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Illinois Dental Practice Act. Provides that a dentist who has completed the appropriate training as set forth by the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation may administer influenza vaccinations to patients 18 years of age or older pursuant to a valid prescription or standing order by a physician licensed to practice medicine in all its branches who, in the course of professional practice, administers vaccines to patients. Provides that vaccines shall be administered by the dentist and shall not be delegated to an assistant or any other person. Requires that a dentist notify the patient's primary care physician of each dose of vaccine administered to the patient and that the vaccination be documented in the patient's dental record and entered in the immunization data registry maintained by the Department of Public Health. Provides that a dentist shall only provide vaccinations under the provisions if contracted with and credentialed by the patient's health insurance, health maintenance organization, or other health plan to provide the vaccinations allowed to be provided under the provisions. Further provides that persons enrolled in Medicare or Medicaid may only receive vaccinations from dentists who are authorized by the federal Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services or the Department of Healthcare and Family Services. Provides that the provisions are repealed on January 1, 2020. Effective immediately.
Senate Amendment 003
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Illinois Dental Practice Act. Provides that a dentist enrolled in a medical network or enrolled as a Medicare or Medicaid provider may administer vaccinations for influenza to patients enrolled in the same medical network or enrolled in Medicare or Medicaid upon completion of appropriate training. Further provides that vaccinations shall be limited to patients 18 years of age and older pursuant to a valid prescription or standing order by a physician and requires notification to the patient's physician and appropriate reporting and record retention. Effective immediately.
Senate Amendment 002
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Illinois Dental Practice Act. Adds a provision that allows dentists enrolled in a medical network or enrolled as a Medicare or Medicaid provider with the appropriate training to administer vaccinations to patients 18 years of age and older pursuant to a valid prescription or standing order of a physician. Provides that vaccinations may only be administered for influenza. Effective immediately.