+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On July 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On June 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As December 31, 2016
On May 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2016
On May 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 27, 2016
On May 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 To Subcommittee on Statutes of Limitation
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
- Sponsor Removed Sen. William R. Haine
On May 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett
On April 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Scott M. Bennett
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 18, 2016
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Assignments
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 7, 2016
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
- Do Pass Executive; 015-000-000
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
+ − Adopted Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 720 ILCS 550/2 - from Ch. 56 1/2, par. 702
+ − Vote
April 6, 2016: SB3402 - Executive
+ − Sponsors (35)
Type:
Primary Sponsor