+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On March 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 30, 2012
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- To Revenue Subcommittee on Tax Credits
On February 17, 2012 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Revenue
On February 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Carole Pankau
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor