+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On July 22, 2010 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1207
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date July 22, 2010
On May 28, 2010 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 29, 2010 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On April 29, 2010 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
On April 28, 2010 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On April 27, 2010 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 006-000-000
On April 20, 2010 in the House:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jehan A. Gordon
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 30, 2010
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On March 11, 2010 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- Referred to Rules Committee
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- First Reading
On March 10, 2010 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
On March 9, 2010 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 10, 2010
- Second Reading
On March 4, 2010 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2010
- Do Pass Criminal Law; 008-000-000
On February 24, 2010 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Criminal Law
On February 10, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Millner
+ − Statute Amended
- 725 ILCS 5/111-4 - from Ch. 38, par. 111-4