+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (67)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1152
- Effective Date December 14, 2018
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Concurs
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 046-001-000
- 3/5 Vote Required
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Gaming; 011-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Gaming
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - November 13, 2018
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - June 7, 2018
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Dave Syverson
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 098-000-000
- Motion to Reconsider Vote - Prevails 099-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Motion Filed to Reconsider Vote Rep. Peter Breen
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-001-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-004-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
- Reported Back To Executive Committee;
- Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Executive Committee; 004-001-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita
- To Gaming Subcommittee
- Assigned to Executive Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
- Arrived in House
- Third Reading - Passed; 045-001-001
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Syverson
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Gaming; 013-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Gaming
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 24, 2018
- Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018
- Do Pass as Amended Gaming; 012-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Gaming
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson
- Assigned to Gaming
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
House Amendment 002
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the provisions of the engrossed bill with the following changes: Amends the Illinois Horse Racing Act of 1975. Effective January 1, 2017, makes changes concerning the distribution of purses from interstate simulcast wagers for non-host licensees who derive their licenses from Fairmount Park Racetrack. Makes conforming changes. In provisions amending the Video Gaming Act, removes provisions concerning restrictions on licenses in malls. Effective immediately.
Senate Amendment 002
In provisions concerning the duties of the Illinois Gaming Board, removes language providing that certain limitations on civil penalties shall not apply to civil penalties assessed under the Video Gaming Act.
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the introduced bill with the following changes: In provisions amending the Riverboat Gambling Act, requires the Illinois Gaming Board to file a written annual report with the Governor on or before July 1 (rather than on or before March 1). Removes changes to provisions concerning wagering tax distributions. In provisions amending the Video Gaming Act, removes changes concerning the limitation of video gaming by a political subdivision.
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (9)
- 230 ILCS 10/5 - from Ch. 120, par. 2405
- 230 ILCS 10/7 - from Ch. 120, par. 2407
- 230 ILCS 10/7.6 -
- 230 ILCS 10/13 - from Ch. 120, par. 2413
- 230 ILCS 40/25 -
- 230 ILCS 40/27 -
- 230 ILCS 40/45 -
- 230 ILCS 40/80 -
- 230 ILCS 5/26 -