+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On January 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On June 1, 2004 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 5, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to Appropriations-Higher Education Committee
On May 4, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On April 29, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
On April 29, 2004 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
On April 20, 2004 in the Senate:
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 21, 2004
On March 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2004
- Do Pass Appropriations II; 013-000-000
On March 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Appropriations II
On February 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 2-10, Deadlines Extended.
- Assigned to Appropriations II
On February 20, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Patrick Welch