+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On January 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On May 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Assignments
On March 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 28, 2012
- Second Reading
On March 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 8, 2012
- Do Pass Human Services; 005-000-000
On February 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Human Services
On February 17, 2012 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Human Services
On February 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul
+ − Statute Amended
- 305 ILCS 5/12-4.25 - from Ch. 23, par. 12-4.25
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor