+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On May 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2020
On May 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 29, 2020
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2020
On April 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 22, 2020
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 15, 2020
On April 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 15, 2020
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 7, 2020
On April 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 30, 2020
On April 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On March 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 7, 2020
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2020
On March 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 2, 2020
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Revenue
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Revenue
On February 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- 35 ILCS 105/2 - from Ch. 120, par. 439.2
- 35 ILCS 105/3-5 -
- 35 ILCS 120/1 - from Ch. 120, par. 440
- 35 ILCS 120/2-5 -
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor