+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (78)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1367
- Effective Date July 28, 2010
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Heather Steans
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 097-020-000
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - May 6, 2010
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Heather Steans
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 055-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive
- Passed Both Houses
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 055-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 012-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 012-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Executive Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Greg Harris
- Assigned to Executive Committee
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 7, 2010
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Greg Harris
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 010-000-000
- Third Reading - Passed; 044-001-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Assignments Refers to Executive
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather Steans
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 15, 2010
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As March 26, 2010
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Postponed - Executive
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Assignments Refers to Executive
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather Steans
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 15, 2010
- Second Reading
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Executive
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather Steans
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 12, 2010
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Executive
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Executive
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Postponed - Executive
- Do Pass Executive; 010-000-003
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather Steans
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 19, 2010
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
- Re-assigned to Executive
- Re-referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather Steans
- Assigned to Commerce
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather Steans
+ − Adopted Amendments (7)
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Liquor Control Act of 1934. Provides for manufacturer's license for Craft Distiller. Provides that a craft distiller license shall allow the manufacture of up to 5,000 gallons of spirits by distillation per year, and the storage and sale of such spirits to (1) distributors in this State, and (2) non-licensees subject to certain limits. Provides that any distiller licensed under the Act on the effective date of the amendatory Act who applies for licensure as a craft distiller and manufactured no more than a certain amount of spirits shall not be required to pay the initial licensing fee. Sets forth the fee amount for a manufacturer license as a craft distiller. Provides that a person licensed as a craft distiller not affiliated with any other person manufacturing spirits may be permitted to receive one retailer's license for the premises in which he or she actually conducts business permitting only the retail sale of spirits manufactured at such premises and that such sales shall be limited to on-premises, in-person sales only, for lawful consumption on or off premises. Provides that a craft distiller licensed for retail sale shall secure a certain amount of liquor liability insurance coverage. Also makes technical changes. Effective immediately.
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Liquor Control Act of 1934. Provides for manufacturer's license for Craft Distiller. Provides that a craft distiller license shall allow the manufacture of up to 5,000 gallons of spirits by distillation per year, and the storage and sale of such spirits to (1) distributors in this State, and (2) non-licensees subject to certain limits. Provides that any distiller licensed under the Act on the effective date of the amendatory Act who applies for licensure as a craft distiller and manufactured no more than a certain amount of spirits shall not be required to pay the initial licensing fee. Sets forth the fee amount for a manufacturer license as a craft distiller. Provides that a person licensed as a craft distiller not affiliated with any other person manufacturing spirits may be permitted to receive one retailer's license for the premises in which he or she actually conducts business permitting only the retail sale of spirits manufactured at such premises and that such sales shall be limited to on-premises, in-person sales only, for lawful consumption on or off premises. Provides that a craft distiller licensed for retail sale shall secure a certain amount of liquor liability insurance coverage. Also makes technical changes. Effective immediately.
+ − Statute Amended
- 235 ILCS 5/5-1 - from Ch. 43, par. 115