+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On August 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Rules
On May 13, 2004 in the Senate:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Emil Jones, Jr.
On March 2, 2004 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Appropriations I
On February 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 2-10, Deadlines Extended.
- Assigned to Appropriations I
On February 19, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Lauzen
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Vince Demuzio
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor