+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (48)
On July 30, 2004 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0842
- Effective Date July 30, 2004
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
On July 24, 2004 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan; Rep. Tom Cross - Rep. Gary Hannig - Rep. Mark H. Beaubien, Jr.
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- Sponsor Removed Rep. Monique D. Davis
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed by Voice Vote
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
- 3/5 Vote Required
On July 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01
On July 24, 2004 in the House:
- Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 105-009-001
On July 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01-July 24, 2004
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Patrick Welch
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Donne E. Trotter
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Rules
- 3/5 Vote Required
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 051-005-000
- Passed Both Houses
On July 15, 2004 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) JULY 31, 2004
On June 30, 2004 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) July 15, 2004
On May 31, 2004 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2004
On May 27, 2004 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate
- Second Reading - Standard Debate
On May 20, 2004 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate
- Second Reading - Standard Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-General Services Committee; 004-002-000
On May 5, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to Appropriations-General Services Committee
On May 4, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On April 30, 2004 in the House:
- Sponsor Removed Rep. Monique D. Davis
On April 29, 2004 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
On April 29, 2004 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
On April 20, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 21, 2004
- Second Reading
On March 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2004
- Do Pass Appropriations II; 013-000-000
On March 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Appropriations II
On February 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 2-10, Deadlines Extended.
- Assigned to Appropriations II
On February 19, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Patrick Welch
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Floor Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything. Makes omnibus appropriations for fiscal year 2005. Amends Public Act 93-681 to provide that Public Act 93-681 is repealed on the earlier of August 1, 2004 or the effective date of this Act. Effective immediately.