+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (41)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 94-0698
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date November 22, 2005
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 042-016-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. M. Maggie Crotty; Change Chief Sponsorship of Motion to Concur-House Amendment No. 1 to Senator Crotty.
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Licensed Activities; 005-002-001
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01-November 2, 2005
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Licensed Activities
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Emil Jones, Jr.
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. M. Maggie Crotty
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-010-000
- 3/5 Vote Required
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Registration and Regulation Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Registration and Regulation Committee; by Voice Vote
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Registration and Regulation Committee; 023-000-001
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Assigned to Registration and Regulation Committee
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) January 11, 2006
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Assigned to Executive Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Third Reading - Passed; 055-001-001
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 9, 2005
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 8, 2005
- Do Pass Licensed Activities; 005-004-000
- Postponed - Licensed Activities
- Assigned to Licensed Activities
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Emil Jones, Jr.
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Elevator Safety and Regulation Act. Exempts a municipality with a population over 500,000 from the Act. Defines "elevator industry apprentice", "elevator helper", and "special purpose personnel elevator". Provides that after January 1, 2006, a person who is not licensed as an elevator mechanic may not work in the jurisdiction of this State as an elevator industry apprentice or helper unless he or she is registered as an elevator industry apprentice or helper by the Office of the State Fire Marshal and works under the direct supervision of an individual licensed under the Act as an elevator mechanic. Provides that the Office shall set elevator industry apprenticeship and helper qualifications and registration procedure by rule. Provides that an applicant for licensure as an elevator mechanic who provides acceptable proof that he or she has worked as an elevator constructor, maintenance, or repair person must make application by May 1, 2006 (now, within one year of the effective date of the Act). Provides that a license issued under the Act must be renewed every 2 years (now, biannually). Removes a provision that requires the Office to inspect all newly installed and existing platform lifts and stairway chair lifts for private residences subsequent to an inspection by a person, firm, or company to which a license to inspect conveyances has been issued. Provides that any owner or lessee who violates any of the provisions of the Act shall be fined in an amount not to exceed $1,500 per violation, per day (now, just $1,500). Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
+ − Statute Amended
- 225 ILCS 410/3-7.1 - from Ch. 111, par. 1703-7.1