+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On May 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Assignments
On March 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 28, 2012
- Second Reading
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2012
- Do Pass Executive; 009-003-000
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On February 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor