+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (39)
On June 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0633
- Effective Date June 5, 2014
- Governor Approved
On June 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 20, 2014 in the House:
- Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
On May 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 20, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 065-049-003
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On May 15, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Fiscal Note Filed
On May 14, 2014 in the House:
- Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed
- State Debt Impact Note Filed
On May 13, 2014 in the House:
- State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
- Home Rule Note Filed
- Pension Note Filed
- Balanced Budget Note Filed
- Judicial Note Filed
On May 12, 2014 in the House:
- Correctional Note Filed
- Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary; 009-004-001
On May 5, 2014 in the House:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. John E. Bradley
On May 1, 2014 in the House:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Arthur Turner
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Arrived in House
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 035-019-000
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 9, 2014
- Second Reading
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 27, 2014
- Do Pass Judiciary; 008-003-000
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Judiciary
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Judiciary
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On February 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul
+ − Statute Amended
- 820 ILCS 305/5 - from Ch. 48, par. 138.5
+ − Votes (2)
May 20, 2014: SB3287 - Third Reading - Tuesday, May 20, 2014
April 9, 2014: SB3287 - Third Reading - Wednesday, April 09, 2014
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor