+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (51)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0846
- Effective Date January 1, 2015
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 056-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 056-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Human Services; 008-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Human Services; 008-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Donne E. Trotter
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Donne E. Trotter
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Human Services
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Human Services
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - May 26, 2014
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-002-000
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 015-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Arrived in House
- Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 2, 2014
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2014
- Do Pass as Amended Human Services; 008-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Postponed - Human Services
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Donne E. Trotter
- Assigned to Human Services
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Donne E. Trotter
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
House Amendment 002
In a provision prohibiting the Department of Children and Family Services from removing a child from the home of a fictive kin on the basis that the fictive kin fails to apply for licensure or fails to meet the standard for licensure, adds language providing that all other requirements established under the rules and procedures of the Department concerning the placement of a child, for whom the Department is legally responsible, with a relative shall apply.
House Amendment 001
Further amends the Children and Family Services Act as follows: Provides that the Department of Children and Family Services shall not remove a child from the home of a fictive kin on the basis that the fictive kin fails to apply for licensure as a foster family home within 6 months of the child's placement with the fictive kin, or fails to meet the standard for licensure. Changes the date by which the Department shall promulgate rules establishing criteria and standards for placement, identification, and licensure of fictive kin from January 1, 2015 to June 1, 2015. Provides that the provisions added to the Children and Family Services Act by this amendatory Act shall become operative on and after June 1, 2015.
Senate Amendment 001
In provisions amending the Children and Family Services Act, changes the definition of "fictive kin" to mean any individual, unrelated by birth or marriage, who is shown to have close personal or emotional ties with the child or the child's family prior to the child's placement with the individual (rather than any individual, whether related or unrelated by birth or marriage, who is shown to have close personal or emotional ties with the child or the child's family prior to the child's placement with the individual). Amends the Child Care Act of 1969. Expands the definitions of "relative" to include a fictive kin as defined in the Children and Family Services Act.
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 20 ILCS 505/7 - from Ch. 23, par. 5007
- 225 ILCS 10/2.04 - from Ch. 23, par. 2212.04
- 225 ILCS 10/2.17 - from Ch. 23, par. 2212.17