+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On January 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Assignments
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor