+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On April 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On April 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2018
- Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Manar
On April 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 007-000-000
On April 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government
On April 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 10, 2018
- Do Pass State Government; 008-000-000
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned to State Government
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Amendment 001
Adds language specifying that certain provisions apply to appropriations for the Office of the Governor enacted after the effective date of this amendatory Act.
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 5 ILCS 220/4.5 -
- 30 ILCS 105/9.03 - from Ch. 127, par. 145d
+ − Votes (2)
April 11, 2018: SFA0001 - State Government
March 14, 2018: SB3233 - State Government
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor