+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On March 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Insurance
On February 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Insurance
On February 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 820 ILCS 310/1 - from Ch. 48, par. 172.36
- 30 ILCS 805/8.36 new -
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor