+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (34)
On July 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0855
- Effective Date July 27, 2012
- Governor Approved
On June 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 24, 2012 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000
On April 24, 2012 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 18, 2012 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On April 17, 2012 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Financial Institutions Committee; 013-000-000
On April 10, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned to Financial Institutions Committee
On March 26, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On March 23, 2012 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
On March 22, 2012 in the House:
- Arrived in House
On March 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 049-000-000
On March 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 22, 2012
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2012
- Do Pass as Amended Financial Institutions; 008-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled in Committee on Financial Institutions
On March 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Financial Institutions
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Held in Financial Institutions
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
On February 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Financial Institutions
On February 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler
On February 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Financial Institutions
On February 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- 205 ILCS 305/1.1 - from Ch. 17, par. 4402
- 205 ILCS 305/15 - from Ch. 17, par. 4416
- 205 ILCS 305/20 - from Ch. 17, par. 4421
- 205 ILCS 305/64.5 new -