+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 16, 2014 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Arrived in House
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 19, 2014
- Second Reading
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 6, 2014
- Do Pass Education; 013-000-000
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Education
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Education
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson