+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On August 17, 2007 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-0273
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date January 1, 2008
On June 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 22, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
On May 21, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 10, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 008-000-000
On April 30, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On March 8, 2007 in the House:
- Arrived in House
On March 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
On March 8, 2007 in the House:
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On March 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 6, 2007
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 2, 2007
- Do Pass State Government and Veterans Affairs; 008-000-000
On February 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs
On February 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
May 22, 2007: SB0321 - Third Reading - Tuesday, May 22, 2007
March 8, 2007: SB0321 - Third Reading - Thursday, March 08, 2007
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor