+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On January 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On February 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As February 18, 2022
- Postponed - Licensed Activities
On January 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Licensed Activities
- Directed to Multiple Committees Licensed Activities, Appropriations- Health Subcommittee
On January 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Simmons
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor