+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On January 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On March 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Judiciary
On March 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
On February 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Judiciary
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Judiciary
On February 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On February 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
+ − Adopted Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor