+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (49)
On December 13, 2005 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 94-0715
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date December 13, 2005
On December 2, 2005 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On November 3, 2005 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 059-000-000
On November 2, 2005 in the Senate:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Judiciary; 008-000-000
On October 27, 2005 in the Senate:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Don Harmon
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01-November 2, 2005
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01
On October 26, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000
- 3/5 Vote Required
On October 25, 2005 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 016-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On October 25, 2005 in the Senate:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
On October 18, 2005 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) January 11, 2006
On May 13, 2005 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 11, 2005 in the House:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Removed Rep. James D. Brosnahan
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. James D. Brosnahan
On April 20, 2005 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On April 14, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
On April 14, 2005 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Cullerton
- Recalled to Second Reading
On April 12, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 010-000-000
On April 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 12, 2005
- Second Reading
On April 7, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Judiciary
On April 6, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary
On March 29, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
On February 24, 2005 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 1, 2005
- Do Pass Judiciary; 010-000-000
On February 17, 2005 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On February 15, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Changes the definition of armed habitual criminal.
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Changes the definition of armed habitual criminal.
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 720 ILCS 5/24-1.7 new -
- 730 ILCS 5/3-6-3 - from Ch. 38, par. 1003-6-3
+ − Votes (3)
November 3, 2005: HCA0001 - Concurrence - Thursday, November 03, 2005
October 26, 2005: SB0319 - Third Reading - Wednesday, October 26, 2005
April 14, 2005: SB0319 - Third Reading - Thursday, April 14, 2005
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor