+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On August 12, 2004 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0931
- Effective Date August 12, 2004
- Governor Approved
On June 15, 2004 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 17, 2004 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 17, 2004 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
On May 14, 2004 in the House:
- Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 31, 2004
On May 13, 2004 in the Senate:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Emil Jones, Jr.
On May 12, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 28, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 010-000-000
On April 20, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On March 30, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On March 26, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
On March 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
On March 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2004
- Second Reading
On February 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 2, 2004
- Do Pass State Government; 009-000-000
On February 18, 2004 in the Senate:
- Assigned to State Government
On February 6, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Vince Demuzio
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
May 17, 2004: SB3189 - Third Reading - Monday, May 17, 2004
March 26, 2004: SB3189 - Third Reading - Friday, March 26, 2004
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor