+ − Summary
+ − Actions (49)
On January 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On September 17, 2012 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On August 17, 2012 in the House:
- Legislation Considered in Special Session No. 1
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Personnel and Pensions Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Personnel and Pensions Committee; 005-004-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted 054-053-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On August 14, 2012 in the House:
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Personnel and Pensions Committee
On May 31, 2012 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 29, 2012 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2012
On May 23, 2012 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 22, 2012 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
On May 18, 2012 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 29, 2012
On May 16, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 18, 2012
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On May 15, 2012 in the House:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
On March 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Link
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Third Reading - Passed; 043-006-000
On March 28, 2012 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On March 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Pensions and Investments; 009-000-000
On March 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Pensions and Investments
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
On February 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 28, 2012
On February 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Do Pass Pensions and Investments; 006-002-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 27, 2012
On February 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Pensions and Investments
On February 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 40 ILCS 5/14-111 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 14-111
- 105 ILCS 5/24-1 - from Ch. 122, par. 24-1