+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On August 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On April 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 4, 2017
- Second Reading
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Heather A. Steans
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
- Do Pass Executive; 014-000-000
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 210 ILCS 25/1-101 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 621-101