+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On September 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
On May 31, 2018 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 25, 2018 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
On May 14, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- Arrived in House
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-001
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018
- Second Reading
On April 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018
- Do Pass Revenue; 006-000-000
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Revenue
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
+ − Statute Amended
- 35 ILCS 5/203 - from Ch. 120, par. 2-203
+ − Votes (2)
April 26, 2018: SB3152 - Third Reading
April 11, 2018: SB3152 - Revenue
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor