+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (38)
On August 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0887
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date August 14, 2018
On June 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 28, 2018 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
On May 25, 2018 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
On May 23, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 18, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On May 16, 2018 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000
On May 7, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 050-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Bennett
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Recalled to Second Reading
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On April 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 009-002-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Judiciary
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 24, 2018
- Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
On April 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett
On April 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018
- Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 011-000-000
On April 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
On April 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Judiciary
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett