+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On October 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On October 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As October 20, 2015
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 22, 2015
- Second Reading
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Heather A. Steans
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 14, 2015
- Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
+ − Adopted Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 5 ILCS 100/1-1 - from Ch. 127, par. 1001-1
+ − Vote
March 25, 2015: SB0313 - Executive - Mar 25, 2015
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor