+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (56)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1347
- Effective Date January 1, 2011
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 048-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 012-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Susan Garrett
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 3, 2010
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-003-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elaine Nekritz
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Tollway Oversight Committee; 008-000-000
- Assigned to Tollway Oversight Committee
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000
- First Reading
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2010
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 11, 2010
- Do Pass as Amended Executive; 008-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Executive
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Executive
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Susan Garrett
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Susan Garrett
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
- Postponed - Executive
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Executive
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 19, 2010
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Susan Garrett
- Assigned to Executive
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Susan Garrett
+ − Adopted Amendments (4)
Senate Committee Amendment No. 3
Adds a provision to the introduced bill, as amended, concerning the rights of employees of the Illinois State Toll Highway Authority that are subject to investigation or inquiry by the Toll Highway Inspector General or any representative or agent of the Toll Highway Inspector General.
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Toll Highway Act. Provides that the Governor shall, with the advice and consent of the Senate by three-fifths of the elected members concurring by record vote, appoint a Toll Highway Inspector General for a 5-year term for the purpose of detection, deterrence, and prevention of fraud, corruption, and mismanagement in the Illinois State Toll Highway Authority. Contains provisions concerning appointment, terms, vacancies, removal, qualifications, jurisdiction, duties, rulemaking authority, budget, and reporting requirements of the Toll Highway Inspector General.
Senate Committee Amendment No. 3
Adds a provision to the introduced bill, as amended, concerning the rights of employees of the Illinois State Toll Highway Authority that are subject to investigation or inquiry by the Toll Highway Inspector General or any representative or agent of the Toll Highway Inspector General.
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 605 ILCS 10/8 - from Ch. 121, par. 100-8
- 605 ILCS 10/32.5 new -