+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (65)
- Motion Filed to Reconsider Vote Sen. William R. Haine
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. William R. Haine
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
- Senate Concurs
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 095-020-001
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - May 31, 2016
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. William R. Haine
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 017-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 017-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 058-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 058-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 009-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Civil Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
- Remains in Judiciary - Civil Committee
- Motion Do Pass - Lost Judiciary - Civil Committee; 005-002-000
- Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2016
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
- Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed 069-046-000
- Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Judiciary - Civil Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Arrived in House
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 19, 2016
- Second Reading
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 27, 2016
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
- Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 011-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Re-assigned to Judiciary
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
- Waive Posting Notice
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
- Re-referred to Judiciary
- Postponed - Executive
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 13, 2016
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 22, 2016
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Postponed - Executive
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine
- Assigned to Executive
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine
+ − Adopted Amendments (4)
House Amendment 002
Deletes language exempting from inspection and copying records requested by a person committed to the Department of Corrections or a county jail if those materials include law enforcement records of other persons in the custody of or committed to the Department of Corrections or a county jail, except as these records may be relevant to the requester's current or potential case or claim. Exempts instead law enforcement records of other persons requested by a person committed to the Department of Corrections or a county jail, including, but not limited to, arrest and booking records, mug shots, and crime scene photographs, except as these records may be relevant to the requester's current or potential case or claim. Deletes language exempting from inspection and copying certain information or materials that the disclosure of which would violate the Supreme Court Rule concerning the disclosure of discovery materials in felony cases. Exempts instead certain information or materials that relate to a criminal case pending at the trial level.
House Amendment 001
Deletes language providing that a public body shall respond to a request for records from a person committed to the Department of Corrections or a county jail within 21 working days after receipt. To provisions exempting disclosure of certain documents while a case is pending at the trial level, adds information and materials of other prosecutors.
Senate Amendment 002
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Freedom of Information Act. Provides that a public body shall respond to a request for records from a person committed to the Department of Corrections or a county jail within 21 working days after receipt. Exempts from disclosure under the Act specified records requested by a person in a county jail or committed to the Department of Corrections. Exempts from inspection and copying, while the case is pending at the trial level, information or materials received, generated, or maintained by a State's Attorney or county sheriff as part of the criminal discovery process that the disclosure of which would violate the Supreme Court Rule concerning the disclosure of discovery materials in felony cases. Effective immediately.
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the provisions of the bill as introduced with the following changes: provides for the exemption from inspection and copying of additional specified records requested by persons committed to the Department of Corrections; and removes a Section concerning persons in custody.
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- 5 ILCS 140/3.7 new -
- 5 ILCS 140/7 - from Ch. 116, par. 207
- 5 ILCS 140/3 - from Ch. 116, par. 203
- 5 ILCS 140/3.4 new -