+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On August 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0862
- Effective Date August 4, 2004
- Governor Approved
On June 9, 2004 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 11, 2004 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 11, 2004 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
On May 4, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 29, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 013-000-000
On April 20, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to Higher Education Committee
On March 29, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On March 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; del Valle
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
On March 26, 2004 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
On March 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Adopted Education; 007-000-000
On March 23, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Education
On March 18, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Miguel del Valle
On February 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 2, 2004
- Second Reading
On February 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 25, 2004
- Do Pass Education; 011-000-000
On February 18, 2004 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Education
On February 6, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Miguel del Valle
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Changes the name of the Program to the Diversifying Higher Education Faculty in Illinois Program. Provides that Illinois institutions that grant doctoral degrees must have representation on the Program Board.
+ − Statutes Amended (13)
- 110 ILCS 930/Act title -
- 110 ILCS 930/1 - from Ch. 144, par. 2301
- 110 ILCS 930/2 - from Ch. 144, par. 2302
- 110 ILCS 930/3 - from Ch. 144, par. 2303
- 110 ILCS 930/4 - from Ch. 144, par. 2304
- 110 ILCS 930/6 - from Ch. 144, par. 2306
- 110 ILCS 930/7 - from Ch. 144, par. 2307
- 110 ILCS 930/8 - from Ch. 144, par. 2308
- 110 ILCS 930/9 - from Ch. 144, par. 2309
- 110 ILCS 930/10 - from Ch. 144, par. 2310
- 110 ILCS 930/11 - from Ch. 144, par. 2311
- 110 ILCS 930/11.5 new -
- 110 ILCS 930/5 rep. -
+ − Votes (2)
May 11, 2004: SB3107 - Third Reading - Tuesday, May 11, 2004
March 26, 2004: SB3107 - Third Reading - Friday, March 26, 2004
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor