+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On January 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On February 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On February 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As February 18, 2022
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On January 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor