+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Executive
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Executive
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On January 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush
+ − Statute Amended
- 775 ILCS 5/2-101 - from Ch. 68, par. 2-101