+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (52)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0801
- Effective Date January 1, 2017
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 3
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 015-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 118-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 3 - May 31, 2016
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Scott M. Bennett
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Senate Concurs 058-000-000
- Senate Concurs
- Passed Both Houses
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emily McAsey
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2016
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emily McAsey
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emily McAsey
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 015-000-000
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Arrived in House
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
- Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 010-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Bennett
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 21, 2016
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 7, 2016
- Do Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 010-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett
- Assigned to Criminal Law
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett
+ − Adopted Amendments (5)
House Amendment 003
Further Amends the Department of State Police Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Division of Forensic Services shall establish administrative rules in order to set forth standardized requirements for the disclosure of toxicology results and other relevant documents related to a toxicological analysis. Provides that these administrative rules are to be adopted to produce uniform and sufficient information to allow a proper, well-informed determination of the admissibility of toxicology evidence and to ensure that this evidence is presented competently. Provides that these administrative rules are designed to provide a minimum standard for compliance of toxicology evidence and is not intended to limit the production and discovery of material information. Provides that the administrative rules shall be submitted by the Department of State Police into the rulemaking process on or before June 30, 2017. Provides that the Department of State Police shall employ laboratory technicians and other specially qualified persons to aid in the identification of criminal activity, and permits the Department of State Police to employ polygraph operators. Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that in consultation with and subject to the approval of the Chief Procurement Officer, the Department of State Police may obtain contracts for services, commodities, and equipment to assist in the timely completion of forensic biology, DNA, drug chemistry, firearms/toolmark, footwear/tire track, latent prints, toxicology, microscopy, trace chemistry, and Combined DNA Index System (CODIS) analysis. Amends the Illinois Procurement Code. Provides that contracts for services, commodities, and equipment to support the delivery of timely forensic science services are not subject to various provisions of the Illinois Procurement Code, but only for a period of 2 years. Makes other changes.
Senate Amendment 002
Provides that a State's Attorney who is notified that a hospital is in possession of sexual assault evidence shall, within 72 hours, contact the appropriate law enforcement agency to request that the law enforcement agency take immediate physical custody of the sexual assault evidence. Makes other technical changes.
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Creates the Sexual Assault Incident Procedure Act. Provides that on or before January 1, 2018, every law enforcement agency shall develop, adopt, and implement written policies regarding procedures for incidents of sexual assault or sexual abuse. Provides that the Office of the Attorney General in consultation with the Illinois Law Enforcement Training Standards Board and the Department of State Police shall develop this model policy. Provides guidelines on reporting of sexual assault and sexual abuse to law enforcement agencies, and the release and storage of sexual assault evidence. Makes corresponding changes in the Illinois Police Training Act, the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois, the Sexual Assault Evidence Submission Act, and the Sexual Assault Survivors Emergency Treatment Act.
+ − Statutes Amended (15)
- 725 ILCS 5/100-1 - from Ch. 38, par. 100-1
- New Act -
- 20 ILCS 2605/2605-53 new -
- 20 ILCS 2605/2605-98 new -
- 50 ILCS 705/7 - from Ch. 85, par. 507
- 50 ILCS 705/10.19 new -
- 410 ILCS 70/1a - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 87-1a
- 410 ILCS 70/6.4 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 87-6.4
- 410 ILCS 70/6.5 new -
- 410 ILCS 70/6.6 new -
- 725 ILCS 202/10 -
- 20 ILCS 2605/2605-40 - was 20 ILCS 2605/55a-4
- 20 ILCS 2605/2605-300 - was 20 ILCS 2605/55a in part
- 30 ILCS 500/1-10 -
- 730 ILCS 5/5-4-3a -