+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (43)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0800
- Effective Date August 12, 2016
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Concurs
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 058-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 011-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Michael E. Hastings
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 29, 2016
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-002-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2016
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang
- Assigned to Executive Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Arrived in House
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Hastings
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 20, 2016
- Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 016-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 7, 2016
- Do Pass Executive; 017-000-000
- Assigned to Executive
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Liquor Control Act of 1934. Provides that no person licensed as a distributor or importing distributor shall be granted a non-resident dealer's license. Provides that no person licensed as a non-resident dealer shall be granted a distributor's or importing distributor's license. Effective immediately.
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Liquor Control Act of 1934. Repeals the definition of "importing distributor". Removes the importing distributor license. Changes the definition of "distributor" to include any person other than a non-resident dealer licensed under the Act who imports into this State, from any point in the United States outside this State, whether for himself or herself or for another, any alcoholic liquors for sale or resale, or for use in the manufacture, preparation, or compounding of products other than alcoholic liquors, or who imports into this State, from any point in the United States outside this State, for consumption in any one calendar year, more than one gallon of such liquors. Provides that a distributor's license also allows the importation of alcoholic liquor by the licensee into this State from any point in the United States outside this State and the purchase of alcoholic liquor in barrels, casks, or other bulk containers and the bottling of such alcoholic liquors before resale thereof, but all bottles or containers so filled shall be sealed, labeled, stamped, and otherwise made to comply with all provisions and rules governing manufacturers in the preparation and bottling of alcoholic liquors. Provides that the distributor's license shall also permit the licensee to purchase alcoholic liquor from Illinois licensed non-resident dealers, foreign importers, and other sources as permitted by the Act. Makes conforming changes. Provides that a distributor's license may not be granted to any holder of a manufacturer's license or holder of a non-resident dealer license. Amends the Alcoholism and Other Drug Abuse and Dependency Act, the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act, and the Counties Code to make conforming changes.
+ − Statutes Amended (44)
- 235 ILCS 5/1-3.15 - from Ch. 43, par. 95.15
- 235 ILCS 5/5-1 - from Ch. 43, par. 115
- 20 ILCS 301/10-15 -
- 35 ILCS 120/3 - from Ch. 120, par. 442
- 55 ILCS 5/3-9007 - from Ch. 34, par. 3-9007
- 235 ILCS 5/1-3.05 - from Ch. 43, par. 95.05
- 235 ILCS 5/1-3.21 - from Ch. 43, par. 95.21
- 235 ILCS 5/1-3.27 - from Ch. 43, par. 95.27
- 235 ILCS 5/1-3.29 - from Ch. 43, par. 95.29
- 235 ILCS 5/1-3.33 -
- 235 ILCS 5/1-3.38 -
- 235 ILCS 5/1-3.42 -
- 235 ILCS 5/3-12 -
- 235 ILCS 5/3-14 - from Ch. 43, par. 109
- 235 ILCS 5/4-4 - from Ch. 43, par. 112
- 235 ILCS 5/5-3 - from Ch. 43, par. 118
- 235 ILCS 5/6-2 - from Ch. 43, par. 120
- 235 ILCS 5/6-4 - from Ch. 43, par. 121
- 235 ILCS 5/6-4.5 -
- 235 ILCS 5/6-5 - from Ch. 43, par. 122
- 235 ILCS 5/6-6 - from Ch. 43, par. 123
- 235 ILCS 5/6-6.3 -
- 235 ILCS 5/6-6.5 -
- 235 ILCS 5/6-7 - from Ch. 43, par. 124
- 235 ILCS 5/6-8 - from Ch. 43, par. 125
- 235 ILCS 5/6-9 - from Ch. 43, par. 126
- 235 ILCS 5/6-17 - from Ch. 43, par. 133
- 235 ILCS 5/6-17.1 -
- 235 ILCS 5/6-22 - from Ch. 43, par. 137
- 235 ILCS 5/6-23 - from Ch. 43, par. 138
- 235 ILCS 5/6-27.1 -
- 235 ILCS 5/6-29 - from Ch. 43, par. 144e
- 235 ILCS 5/6-29.1 -
- 235 ILCS 5/6-31 -
- 235 ILCS 5/7-1 - from Ch. 43, par. 145
- 235 ILCS 5/7-6 - from Ch. 43, par. 150
- 235 ILCS 5/8-1 -
- 235 ILCS 5/8-2 - from Ch. 43, par. 159
- 235 ILCS 5/8-5 - from Ch. 43, par. 163a
- 235 ILCS 5/8-10 - from Ch. 43, par. 164
- 235 ILCS 5/9-13 - from Ch. 43, par. 176
- 235 ILCS 5/10-1 - from Ch. 43, par. 183
- 235 ILCS 5/10-7.1 - from Ch. 43, par. 189.1
- 235 ILCS 5/1-3.16 rep. -