+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On January 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On May 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Assignments
On March 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 26, 2012
On March 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 23, 2012
- Second Reading
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2012
- Do Pass Executive; 012-000-000
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On February 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christine Radogno
+ − Statute Amended
- 720 ILCS 5/1-2 - from Ch. 38, par. 1-2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor