+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On August 17, 2007 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-0271
- Effective Date January 1, 2008
- Governor Approved
On June 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 22, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
On May 21, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 16, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On May 15, 2007 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation and Motor Vehicles Committee; 016-000-000
On April 30, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Transportation and Motor Vehicles Committee
On March 29, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
On March 29, 2007 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On March 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2007
- Second Reading
On March 14, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 15, 2007
- Do Pass as Amended Transportation; 009-000-000
On March 13, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John M. Sullivan
On March 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Transportation
On February 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Transportation
On February 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. John M. Sullivan
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Provides that the Department of Transportation shall evaluate, fund, and repair within the right-of-way (instead of evaluate, fund, repair, and upgrade) the entrances to public educational facilities that border State highways.