+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 011-000-001
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On January 12, 2021 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
On January 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Ann Gillespie
On January 12, 2021 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris
On January 8, 2021 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 008-005-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
On January 7, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris
On January 2, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
- Assigned to Executive Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
On December 30, 2020 in the House:
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Arrived in House
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 25, 2020
- Second Reading
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 20, 2020
- Do Pass State Government; 007-000-000
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Assigned to State Government
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the State Treasurer Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning bond.
+ − Proposed Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 15 ILCS 505/16.6 -
- 15 ILCS 505/1 - from Ch. 130, par. 1
+ − Votes (4)
January 12, 2021: HFA0002 - Executive
January 8, 2021: SB3071 - Executive
March 4, 2020: SB3071 - Third Reading
February 19, 2020: SB3071 - State Government
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor