+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (39)
On May 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date January 1, 2023
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1000
On May 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 057-000-001
- Senate Concurs
- Passed Both Houses
On April 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Laura M. Murphy
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Judiciary
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Judiciary; 006-000-001
On March 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - March 31, 2022
On March 30, 2022 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
On March 28, 2022 in the House:
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On March 24, 2022 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 018-000-000
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 22, 2022 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
On March 21, 2022 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Margaret Croke
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
On March 7, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 23, 2022
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Do Pass Judiciary; 007-000-001
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 17, 2022
On February 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported Back To Judiciary; 002-000-001
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As February 18, 2022
On February 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary- Property Law
On January 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On January 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that an association may, on behalf of all or several of the owners that constitute the association, file an appeal to the Property Tax Appeal Board or intervene in an appeal filed by a taxing body. Defines "association" as: (1) a common interest community association; (2) a unit owners' association; or (3) a master association.