+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On May 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On May 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-assigned to Higher Education
On May 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
On May 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On April 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
On April 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018
On April 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Higher Education
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Higher Education
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Higher Education
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor