+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On November 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Julie A. Morrison
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On January 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assigned to State Government
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -