+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On February 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary- Property Law
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings
+ − Statute Amended
- 735 ILCS 5/15-1503 - from Ch. 110, par. 15-1503
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor